Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB624 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021