Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB652 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 24, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 9, 2021