House | 05/05/2021 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 11/24/2020 | Filed |