Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB67 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 18, 2021