Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021