Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB700 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021