Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB707 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Moody, Murr (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 707
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on expanding recovery housing in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this Act, "recovery housing" means a
 shared living environment that promotes sustained recovery from
 substance use disorders by integrating residents into the
 surrounding community and providing a setting that connects
 residents to supports and services promoting sustained recovery
 from substance use disorders, is centered on peer support, and is
 free from alcohol and drug use.
 (b)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall conduct a
 study to evaluate the current status of and opportunities,
 challenges, and needs to expand recovery housing in this state.
 (c)  In conducting the study, the Health and Human Services
 Commission shall:
 (1)  identify and evaluate state and federal regulatory
 deficiencies and potential impacts on recovery housing, including
 the impacts on local government resources and interests of the
 surrounding community;
 (2)  create focus groups with community stakeholders
 interested in recovery housing;
 (3)  interview stakeholders and experts in recovery
 housing that represent both rural and urban areas of this state;
 (4)  conduct site visits to recovery houses, including
 site visits to recovery houses demonstrating different models of
 recovery housing in both rural and urban areas of this state; and
 (5)  review scholarly research on recovery housing.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall prepare and submit to the legislature a
 written report containing the results of the study and any
 recommendations for legislative or other action, including policy
 changes and the adoption or implementation of best practices and
 training and technical assistance resources.
 (e)  This Act expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *