1 | | - | H.B. No. 707 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Moody, Murr (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 707 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to a study on expanding recovery housing in this state. |
---|
6 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 13 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this Act, "recovery housing" means a |
---|
8 | 14 | | shared living environment that promotes sustained recovery from |
---|
9 | 15 | | substance use disorders by integrating residents into the |
---|
10 | 16 | | surrounding community and providing a setting that connects |
---|
11 | 17 | | residents to supports and services promoting sustained recovery |
---|
12 | 18 | | from substance use disorders, is centered on peer support, and is |
---|
13 | 19 | | free from alcohol and drug use. |
---|
14 | 20 | | (b) The Health and Human Services Commission shall conduct a |
---|
15 | 21 | | study to evaluate the current status of and opportunities, |
---|
16 | 22 | | challenges, and needs to expand recovery housing in this state. |
---|
17 | 23 | | (c) In conducting the study, the Health and Human Services |
---|
18 | 24 | | Commission shall: |
---|
19 | 25 | | (1) identify and evaluate state and federal regulatory |
---|
20 | 26 | | deficiencies and potential impacts on recovery housing, including |
---|
21 | 27 | | the impacts on local government resources and interests of the |
---|
22 | 28 | | surrounding community; |
---|
23 | 29 | | (2) create focus groups with community stakeholders |
---|
24 | 30 | | interested in recovery housing; |
---|
25 | 31 | | (3) interview stakeholders and experts in recovery |
---|
26 | 32 | | housing that represent both rural and urban areas of this state; |
---|
27 | 33 | | (4) conduct site visits to recovery houses, including |
---|
28 | 34 | | site visits to recovery houses demonstrating different models of |
---|
29 | 35 | | recovery housing in both rural and urban areas of this state; and |
---|
30 | 36 | | (5) review scholarly research on recovery housing. |
---|
31 | 37 | | (d) Not later than December 1, 2022, the Health and Human |
---|
32 | 38 | | Services Commission shall prepare and submit to the legislature a |
---|
33 | 39 | | written report containing the results of the study and any |
---|
34 | 40 | | recommendations for legislative or other action, including policy |
---|
35 | 41 | | changes and the adoption or implementation of best practices and |
---|
36 | 42 | | training and technical assistance resources. |
---|
37 | 43 | | (e) This Act expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
38 | 44 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
39 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
40 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
41 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 707 was passed by the House on April |
---|
42 | | - | 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 100, Nays 43, 2 present, not |
---|
43 | | - | voting. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 707 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
47 | | - | 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 6. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
50 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Date |
---|
52 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 45 | + | * * * * * |
---|