Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB72 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021