1 | | - | H.B. No. 721 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Wilson (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 721 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
| 4 | + | Justice; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 24, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 721 By: Whitmire |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the release to mandatory supervision of certain inmates |
---|
6 | 14 | | confined in a county jail. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 508, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 508.1471 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 508.1471. RELEASE TO MANDATORY SUPERVISION OF CERTAIN |
---|
11 | 19 | | INMATES CONFINED IN COUNTY JAIL. (a) This section applies only to |
---|
12 | 20 | | an inmate who, at the time the inmate is sentenced to a term of |
---|
13 | 21 | | imprisonment in the department, is: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (1) confined in a county jail; and |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) eligible for immediate release to mandatory |
---|
16 | 24 | | supervision. |
---|
17 | 25 | | (b) Before an inmate is released from a county jail to |
---|
18 | 26 | | mandatory supervision, the department shall provide notice to a |
---|
19 | 27 | | victim, guardian of a victim, or close relative of a deceased victim |
---|
20 | 28 | | that the inmate is eligible for release to mandatory supervision. |
---|
21 | 29 | | The notice must be sent to the address provided in the victim impact |
---|
22 | 30 | | statement or submitted under Section 508.117(b) and must state that |
---|
23 | 31 | | the victim, guardian, or close relative may submit, not later than |
---|
24 | 32 | | the 14th day after the date of the notice, a written statement to |
---|
25 | 33 | | the parole panel considering the inmate's release regarding: |
---|
26 | 34 | | (1) the offense; |
---|
27 | 35 | | (2) the inmate; and |
---|
28 | 36 | | (3) the effect of the offense on the victim, guardian, |
---|
29 | 37 | | or close relative. |
---|
30 | 38 | | (c) Notwithstanding any other law, the parole panel may |
---|
31 | 39 | | interview a victim, guardian of a victim, or close relative of a |
---|
32 | 40 | | deceased victim regarding the release of the inmate to mandatory |
---|
33 | 41 | | supervision. |
---|
34 | 42 | | (d) In this section, "victim," "guardian of a victim," and |
---|
35 | 43 | | "close relative of a deceased victim" have the meanings assigned by |
---|
36 | 44 | | Section 508.117. |
---|
37 | 45 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to a |
---|
38 | 46 | | defendant who is sentenced for an offense on or after the effective |
---|
39 | 47 | | date of this Act, regardless of whether the offense is committed |
---|
40 | 48 | | before, on, or after that date. |
---|
41 | 49 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
44 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 721 was passed by the House on April |
---|
45 | | - | 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 6, 2 present, not |
---|
46 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
47 | | - | No. 721 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 |
---|
48 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 721 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
52 | | - | amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
53 | | - | 0. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
56 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Date |
---|
58 | | - | __________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 50 | + | * * * * * |
---|