Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB735 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2020

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021