Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB740 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021