Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB744 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021