Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB763 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021