Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB769 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 769
1+By: Middleton, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 769
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
3+ May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
4+ Resources & Economic Development; May 19, 2021, rereferred to
5+ Committee on Jurisprudence; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with
6+ favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
7+ Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 769 By: Hinojosa
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the administration of the Texas Windstorm Insurance
615 Association.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 2210, Insurance Code, is
918 amended by adding Section 2210.3512 to read as follows:
1019 Sec. 2210.3512. REQUIREMENT FOR VOTE ON RATE FILING. The
11- board of directors may not vote on a proposed rate increase if:
12- (1) there is a vacancy on the board; and
13- (2) the vacancy has existed for at least 60 days at the
14- time the vote is to be taken.
20+ board of directors may not vote on a proposed rate filing if there
21+ is a vacancy on the board.
1522 SECTION 2. The heading to Section 2210.453, Insurance Code,
1623 is amended to read as follows:
1724 Sec. 2210.453. FUNDING LEVELS; REINSURANCE AND ALTERNATIVE
1825 RISK FINANCING MECHANISMS; REINSURANCE FROM CERTAIN INSURER OR
1926 BROKER PROHIBITED.
2027 SECTION 3. Section 2210.453, Insurance Code, is amended by
2128 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
2229 (f) The association may not purchase reinsurance under this
2330 section from an insurer or broker involved in the execution of a
2431 catastrophe model on which the association relies in:
2532 (1) determining the probable maximum loss applicable
2633 for the period covered by the reinsurance; or
2734 (2) adopting rates under Section 2210.355.
2835 SECTION 4. The Texas Department of Insurance shall amend
2936 the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association's plan of operation to
3037 conform to the changes in law made by this Act not later than the
3138 60th day after the effective date of this Act.
3239 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
33- ______________________________ ______________________________
34- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
35- I certify that H.B. No. 769 was passed by the House on April
36- 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 120, Nays 9, 1 present, not
37- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
38- No. 769 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 127, Nays 14,
39- 1 present, not voting.
40- ______________________________
41- Chief Clerk of the House
42- I certify that H.B. No. 769 was passed by the Senate, with
43- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 22, Nays
44- 9.
45- ______________________________
46- Secretary of the Senate
47- APPROVED: __________________
48- Date
49- __________________
50- Governor
40+ * * * * *