Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB773 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021