Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB775 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2021