Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB795 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021