Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB797 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2021
Analysis March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 6, 2021