Senate | 04/19/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Record vote RV#243 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Amended 2-Krause, Anchia, and Martinez | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Amended 1-Krause | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Postponed 4/14/21 12:15 PM | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 12/14/2020 | Filed |