Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB834 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2021