Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB837 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021