Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB876 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 18, 2021