Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB964 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021