Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB967 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021