Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB998 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 3, 2021