Senate | 05/24/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Record vote RV#1297 | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Filed |