House | 05/11/2021 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Companion considered in lieu of SCR 11 | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Filed |