House | 05/14/2021 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Companion considered in lieu of SCR 1 | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Corrections | ||
House | 11/13/2020 | Filed |