Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021