Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR83 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021