Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR84 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021