|
06/18/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/28/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Record vote RV#1218
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|