Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR125 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2021
Fiscal Note March 26, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021