Senate | 05/05/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Record vote RV#641 | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Adopted as amended | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Amended 2-Zwiener, Hinojosa, and Reynolds | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Amended 1-Huberty | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Postponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Postponed 4/28/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Filed |