Senate | 05/14/2021 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Record vote RV#999 | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Filed |