Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR115 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/18/2021

                            H.R. No. 115


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The death of Dr. Charles Eugene Cowles Jr. on
 December 26, 2020, at the age of 52, leaves his loved ones to
 reflect on a life of meaningful accomplishments and dedicated
 service to his profession and his community; and
 WHEREAS, Charles Cowles Jr. was born in Houston to Charles
 and Carol Cowles on April 19, 1968, and he grew up with two
 siblings, Jo Ann and Connie; after graduating from Greenwood
 Village Christian Academy, he earned an associate degree in nursing
 from the State University of New York and a bachelor's degree in
 sports medicine from the University of Houston-Clear Lake; and
 WHEREAS, From 1989 to 1998, Mr. Cowles worked as a
 firefighter and senior paramedic in Beaumont, and from 1993 to
 2004, he also taught and served as clinical coordinator of
 emergency management services courses at San Jacinto College; he
 completed his medical degree at The University of Texas Medical
 School at Houston and served his residency in anesthesiology at The
 University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston; in 2013, he
 received a master's degree in business administration from the
 Physician Executive MBA Program of the University of Tennessee,
 Knoxville; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Cowles was an associate professor and assistant
 clinical director at The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer
 Center, where he was also divisional chief safety officer, incident
 commander, and vice chair of the Acute and Critical Care Committee;
 as a researcher, he specialized in the prevention of surgical and
 operating room fires, neuro-anesthesiology, and tactical and
 disaster medicine; he was a Fellow of the American Society of
 Anesthesiologists; and
 WHEREAS, In addition, Dr. Cowles served as the public health
 officer for the City of Pasadena, earning a commendation from the
 Harris County Precinct 8 Constable's Office; he was a board member
 of the Pasadena Police Department's Emergency Response and SWAT
 teams and the Houston Regional Active Attack Coordinated Training
 Group, and he taught CPR and Stop the Bleed programs in his
 community and at the Texas Capitol; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Cowles served his profession as assistant
 treasurer of the Texas Society of Anesthesiologists,
 treasurer/secretary of the Harris County Medical Society, chair of
 the Texas Medical Association Council on Medical Education,
 alternate delegate to the board of the American Society of
 Anesthesiologists, and trustee of the Gulf Coast Regional Blood
 Center and the Texas Medical Association Insurance Trust; and
 WHEREAS, A man of deep religious faith, Dr. Cowles was a
 deacon at First Baptist Church of Pasadena and a board member of
 First Baptist Christian Academy and Youth Reach Houston, a
 faith-based program for young men; he was also a proud conservative
 Republican, and he often traveled to Austin and Washington, D.C.,
 to advocate on behalf of his patients; and
 WHEREAS, In 1995, Dr. Cowles met the love of his life,
 Jennifer Kendrick, who was attending an emergency medical
 technician course he was teaching; ever the professional, he waited
 until the final day of the course to ask her on their first date,
 which was on New Year's Eve 1995, and on May 19, 2000, the couple
 were married; together they had three sons, Christopher, Caleb, and
 Jake, whom Dr. Cowles referred to as "his cowboys"; a warm-hearted
 man with a quick wit and a deep laugh, he was a skilled cook and
 hunter, and he also took great pleasure in sipping bourbon, rooting
 for the Houston Astros, wearing wild socks, listening to music, and
 following the fortunes of the space program; and
 WHEREAS, Charles Cowles was admired and respected for his
 considerable gifts and achievements, as well as for his devotion to
 his family, state, and nation, and he will forever remain a source
 of inspiration for those he leaves behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Dr. Charles Eugene
 Cowles Jr. and extend heartfelt sympathy to his relatives and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of
 Dr. Charles Cowles Jr.
 Oliverson
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 115 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 10, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House