House | 05/26/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/23/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/21/2021 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Filed |