House | 05/14/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Record vote RV#1202 | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Filed |