House | 04/30/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Record vote RV#579 | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to House Administration | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Filed |