Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR425 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/07/2021

                    H.R. No. 425


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Officer Mitchell Aaron Penton of the Dallas Police
 Department died in the line of duty on February 13, 2021, at the age
 of 27, bringing a tragic loss to his family, friends, and community;
 and
 WHEREAS, Born in Arlington on March 29, 1993, to Timothy and
 Kathy Penton, Mitchell Penton grew up with the companionship of two
 siblings, Garrett and Sydney; after graduating from Richardson High
 School in 2011, he attended Rogers State University in Oklahoma,
 where he demonstrated his athletic talent as a goalkeeper for the
 school's soccer team; he went on to earn his degree in criminal
 justice in 2015; and
 WHEREAS, Officer Penton completed his police academy
 training on November 1, 2019, and joined the Dallas Police
 Department; assigned to the Northeast Patrol Division, he embraced
 his calling in law enforcement, and he was recognized as a promising
 young officer with a bright future ahead of him; and
 WHEREAS, Devoted to his family, Officer Penton cherished the
 relationship he shared with his wife, Noel Bergenske Penton; he
 became a proud stepfather to her son, and the couple were eagerly
 anticipating the birth of their first child together; in his
 leisure hours, he greatly enjoyed playing soccer, woodworking, and
 spending quality time with his loved ones; and
 WHEREAS, The untimely death of Officer Mitchell Penton has
 profoundly saddened everyone who was privileged to know this
 courageous and dedicated young man, but his service and sacrifice
 in behalf of his community will forever be remembered; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Officer Mitchell
 Aaron Penton and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his
 family, to his friends, and to his brothers and sisters in blue;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Officer
 Mitchell Aaron Penton.
 Ramos
 González of Dallas
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 425 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 1, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House