Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR474 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/14/2021

                            H.R. No. 474


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Residents of El Paso were deeply saddened by the
 untimely death of Lillian E. Blancas, a widely respected attorney
 and El Paso County magistrate judge, on December 7, 2020, at the age
 of 47; and
 WHEREAS, A native of El Paso, Lillian Blancas was born to
 Victor and Maria Elena Blancas on May 2, 1973, and she was raised
 with the companionship of two brothers, Moises and Victor, and a
 sister, Gabby; her parents, who emigrated from Mexico, believed
 strongly in the importance of education, and Ms. Blancas and all
 three of her siblings went on to become first-generation college
 graduates; after receiving a degree in political science from The
 University of Texas at El Paso in 2002, she taught middle school
 science in El Paso for several years and then pursued her legal
 education at the Texas Tech University School of Law; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Blancas acquired valuable experience while
 working as an assistant district attorney in El Paso; after
 transitioning to being a public defender, she provided counsel to
 underprivileged and often very young defendants, and on the side,
 she mentored other lawyers who were interested in working with
 indigent clients and clients with mental health issues; she was
 known as a skilled and hardworking advocate for those she
 represented, and she endeared herself to her colleagues with her
 abundant compassion, charm, and wit; and
 WHEREAS, In 2019, Ms. Blancas struck out on her own and went
 into private practice; she had long dreamed of ascending to the
 bench, and after working part-time as a criminal law magistrate
 judge, she decided to run for a judicial seat on the El Paso
 Municipal Court; securing 40 percent of the vote in the general
 election held on November 3, she was then posthumously declared the
 winner of the runoff election on December 12, 2020, five days after
 her passing; and
 WHEREAS, Lillian Blancas earned the admiration and affection
 of countless people through her lifelong commitment to advancing
 justice for all, and she will be greatly missed by all who were
 privileged to know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Lillian E. Blancas and
 extend heartfelt condolences to her family, friends, and
 colleagues; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Lillian E.
 Blancas.
 Fierro
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 474 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 9, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House