House | 05/05/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2021 | Filed |