Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1018 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021