Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1020 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021