House | 04/16/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Amendment withdrawn | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Paxton | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Amendment adopted as amended FA1 Hinojosa | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Amendment amended | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Amendment to amendment offered FA2 Hinojosa | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |