Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1029 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2021