Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021