Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1055 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 1055


 AN ACT
 relating to motor vehicle accidents involving a vulnerable road
 user within the area of a crosswalk and to requiring the operator of
 a vehicle to yield the right-of-way to a pedestrian; creating a
 criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Lisa Torry Smith
 Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter I, Chapter 545, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 545.428 to read as follows:
 Sec. 545.428.  MOTOR VEHICLE ACCIDENT INVOLVING PEDESTRIAN
 OR OTHER VULNERABLE ROAD USER WITHIN AREA OF CROSSWALK; OFFENSE.
 (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Electric personal assistive mobility device" has
 the meaning assigned by Section 551.201.
 (2)  "Golf cart" has the meaning assigned by Section
 551.401.
 (3)  "Motor-assisted scooter" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 551.351.
 (4)  "Neighborhood electric vehicle" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 551.301.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person with criminal
 negligence:
 (1)  operates a motor vehicle within the area of a
 crosswalk; and
 (2)  causes bodily injury to a pedestrian or a person
 operating a bicycle, motor-assisted scooter, electronic personal
 assistive mobility device, neighborhood electric vehicle, or golf
 cart.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor,
 except that the offense is a state jail felony if the person
 described by Subsection (b)(2) suffered serious bodily injury.
 (d)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under this
 section that, at the time of the offense, the person described by
 Subsection (b)(2) was violating a provision of this subtitle
 relating to walking, movement, or operation in a crosswalk or on a
 roadway.
 (e)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 544.007(b) and (c), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  An operator of a vehicle facing a circular green signal
 may proceed straight or turn right or left unless a sign prohibits
 the turn. The operator shall, while the signal is exhibited:
 (1)  yield the right-of-way to other vehicles [and to
 pedestrians] lawfully in the intersection [or an adjacent
 crosswalk] when the signal is exhibited; and
 (2)  stop and yield the right-of-way to pedestrians
 lawfully in the intersection or an adjacent crosswalk.
 (c)  An operator of a vehicle facing a green arrow signal,
 displayed alone or with another signal, may cautiously enter the
 intersection to move in the direction permitted by the arrow or
 other indication shown simultaneously. The operator shall stop and
 yield the right-of-way to a pedestrian lawfully in an adjacent
 crosswalk and shall yield the right-of-way to other traffic
 lawfully using the intersection.
 SECTION 4.  Section 552.002(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A pedestrian facing a "Walk" signal may proceed across a
 roadway in the direction of the signal, and the operator of a
 vehicle shall stop and yield the right-of-way to the pedestrian.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 552.003(a) and (b), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The operator of a vehicle shall stop and yield the
 right-of-way to a pedestrian crossing a roadway in a crosswalk if:
 (1)  no traffic control signal is in place or in
 operation; and
 (2)  the pedestrian is:
 (A)  on the half of the roadway in which the
 vehicle is traveling; or
 (B)  approaching so closely from the opposite half
 of the roadway as to be in danger.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a pedestrian may not
 suddenly leave a curb or other place of safety and proceed into a
 crosswalk in the path of a vehicle so close that it is impossible
 for the vehicle operator to stop and yield.
 SECTION 6.  Section 552.006(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The operator of a vehicle emerging from or entering an
 alley, building, or private road or driveway shall stop and yield
 the right-of-way to a pedestrian approaching on a sidewalk
 extending across the alley, building entrance or exit, road, or
 driveway.
 SECTION 7.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense was
 committed before that date.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1055 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1055 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 70,
 Nays 57, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor