Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1056 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 1056


 AN ACT
 relating to criminal liability for reporting false information to
 draw an emergency response; creating an offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 42, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 42.0601 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0601.  FALSE REPORT TO INDUCE EMERGENCY RESPONSE.
 (a)  A person commits an offense if:
 (1)  the person makes a report of a criminal offense or
 an emergency or causes a report of a criminal offense or an
 emergency to be made to a peace officer, law enforcement agency,
 9-1-1 service as defined by Section 771.001, Health and Safety
 Code, official or volunteer agency organized to deal with
 emergencies, or any other governmental employee or contractor who
 is authorized to receive reports of a criminal offense or
 emergency;
 (2)  the person knows that the report is false;
 (3)  the report causes an emergency response from a law
 enforcement agency or other emergency responder; and
 (4)  in making the report or causing the report to be
 made, the person is reckless with regard to whether the emergency
 response by a law enforcement agency or other emergency responder
 may directly result in bodily injury to another person.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor,
 except that the offense is:
 (1)  a state jail felony if it is shown on the trial of
 the offense that the defendant has previously been convicted two or
 more times of an offense under this section; or
 (2)  a felony of the third degree if:
 (A)  the false report was of a criminal offense to
 which a law enforcement agency or other emergency responder
 responded; and
 (B)  a person suffered serious bodily injury or
 death as a direct result of lawful conduct arising out of that
 response.
 (c)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another section of this code, the
 actor may be prosecuted under either section or both sections.
 (d)  This section may not be construed in any manner to
 conflict with 47 U.S.C. Section 230 or 42 U.S.C. Section 1983.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 13, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 13.40 to read as follows:
 Art. 13.40.  FALSE REPORT TO INDUCE EMERGENCY RESPONSE. An
 offense under Section 42.0601, Penal Code, may be prosecuted in any
 county in which:
 (1)  the defendant resides;
 (2)  the false report was made; or
 (3)  a law enforcement agency or other emergency
 responder responded to the false report.
 SECTION 3.  Article 42.014(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In the trial of an offense under Title 5, Penal Code, or
 Section 28.02, 28.03, [or] 28.08, or 42.0601, Penal Code, the judge
 shall make an affirmative finding of fact and enter the affirmative
 finding in the judgment of the case if at the guilt or innocence
 phase of the trial, the judge or the jury, whichever is the trier of
 fact, determines beyond a reasonable doubt that the defendant
 intentionally selected the person against whom the offense was
 committed, or intentionally selected the person's property that was
 damaged or affected as a result of the offense, because of the
 defendant's bias or prejudice against a group identified by race,
 color, disability, religion, national origin or ancestry, age,
 gender, or sexual preference or by status as a peace officer or
 judge.
 SECTION 4.  Article 42.037, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (w) to read as follows:
 (w)  If a defendant is convicted of an offense under Section
 42.0601, Penal Code, the court may order the defendant to make
 restitution to an entity for the reasonable costs of the emergency
 response by that entity resulting from the false report.
 SECTION 5.  Section 51.03(b), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Conduct indicating a need for supervision is:
 (1)  subject to Subsection (f), conduct, other than a
 traffic offense, that violates:
 (A)  the penal laws of this state of the grade of
 misdemeanor that are punishable by fine only; or
 (B)  the penal ordinances of any political
 subdivision of this state;
 (2)  the voluntary absence of a child from the child's
 home without the consent of the child's parent or guardian for a
 substantial length of time or without intent to return;
 (3)  conduct prohibited by city ordinance or by state
 law involving the inhalation of the fumes or vapors of paint and
 other protective coatings or glue and other adhesives and the
 volatile chemicals itemized in Section 485.001, Health and Safety
 Code;
 (4)  an act that violates a school district's
 previously communicated written standards of student conduct for
 which the child has been expelled under Section 37.007(c),
 Education Code;
 (5)  notwithstanding Subsection (a)(1), conduct
 described by Section 43.02(a) or (b), Penal Code; [or]
 (6)  notwithstanding Subsection (a)(1), conduct that
 violates Section 43.261, Penal Code; or
 (7)  notwithstanding Subsection (a)(1), conduct that
 violates Section 42.0601, Penal Code, if the child has not
 previously been adjudicated as having engaged in conduct violating
 that section.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1056 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1056 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor